Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 04:16:32 (UTC).

MAGNOLIA GROVE PROPERTY HOLDINGS -VS- IDONYA RENTZ

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MAGNOLIA GROVE PROPERTY HOLDINGS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against IDONYA RENTZ. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0714

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGNOLIA GROVE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

THE PARK AT RIALTO II

Defendant

IDONYA RENTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL MORATORIUM ON EVICTIONS FAQ & CDC DECLARATION

03/05/2021: NOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL MORATORIUM ON EVICTIONS FAQ & CDC DECLARATION

ANSWER BY DEFT

03/05/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT

LETTER TO DEFT FROM SEMINOLE COUNTY

03/05/2021: LETTER TO DEFT FROM SEMINOLE COUNTY

LETTER / EMAIL & STATEMENTS

03/05/2021: LETTER / EMAIL & STATEMENTS

NOTICE OF FILING TAX DOCUMENTS

03/05/2021: NOTICE OF FILING TAX DOCUMENTS

AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

03/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

LETTER TO DEFT FROM OODA HEALTH INC

03/05/2021: LETTER TO DEFT FROM OODA HEALTH INC

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IDONYA RENTZ PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO DEFT FROM OODA HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FEDERAL MORATORIUM ON EVICTIONS FAQ & CDC DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING TAX DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / EMAIL & STATEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO DEFT FROM SEMINOLE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D IDONYA RENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PARK AT RIALTO II is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON