This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/26/2022 at 02:13:28 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- JOSE GUDINO

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE GUDINO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2020

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOSE GUDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER MASIN

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

06/14/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

2022-06-14 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

COMPLAINT FILED

06/14/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 6/15/22

06/15/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 6/15/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED -JOSE GUDINO 7/1/22

07/01/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED -JOSE GUDINO 7/1/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

07/21/2022: MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

08/30/2022: MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY LITIGATION & COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED -JOSE GUDINO 7/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 6/15/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ