Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 15:54:47 (UTC).

LITTLE RIVER FEE OWNER LLC -VS- JAMES HEINSEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 LITTLE RIVER FEE OWNER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JAMES HEINSEN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0741

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LITTLE RIVER FEE OWNER LLC

EDGE AT LAKE LOTUS

Defendants

JAMES HEINSEN

AMBER COTTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH LOWENHAUPT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D JAMES HEINSEN PSTD 3/8/21

03/11/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D JAMES HEINSEN PSTD 3/8/21

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/12/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFT'S ANSWER & ENTERING DEFAULT BY PLTF

04/02/2021: MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFT'S ANSWER & ENTERING DEFAULT BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

04/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

04/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

THREE DAY NOTICE

03/17/2021: THREE DAY NOTICE

THREE DAY NOTICE

03/17/2021: THREE DAY NOTICE

THREE DAY NOTICE

03/17/2021: THREE DAY NOTICE

ANSWER BY DEFT JAMES HEINSEN

03/15/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT JAMES HEINSEN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/26/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES HEINSEN

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES HEINSEN

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D AMBER COTTON

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D AMBER COTTON

COMPLAINT FILED

02/26/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT OF RENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFT'S ANSWER & ENTERING DEFAULT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF MONEY ORDER - $400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT JAMES HEINSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D JAMES HEINSEN PSTD 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D AMBER COTTON PSTD 3/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D AMBER COTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JAMES HEINSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNETH LOWENHAUPT