This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 20:22:47 (UTC).

KRUSHALKUMAR R PATEL -VS- ARIKABEN JAGDISHKUMAR PATEL

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 KRUSHALKUMAR R PATEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARIKABEN JAGDISHKUMAR PATEL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2232

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRUSHALKUMAR R PATEL

Respondent

ARIKABEN JAGDISHKUMAR PATEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADAM POLLACK

Respondent Attorney

DIKSHA SHARMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketMEMORANDUM BY CLERK TO ADAM LLOYD POLLACK ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR RESP AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS / D SHARMA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS / A PATEL 7/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE / K PATEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / K PATEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS / A POLLACK ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER / K PATEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR PETNR / A POLLACK ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM POLLACK