This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 05:05:11 (UTC).

JOSIANE WARD -VS- STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 JOSIANE WARD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0228

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSIANE WARD

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATIE MONROE

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER VELAZCO

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

01/31/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM FL INS CO

01/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM FL INS CO

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

01/31/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

01/31/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/10/23

02/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/10/23

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT & DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

03/08/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT & DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JENNIFER L VELAZCO ESQ OBO DEFT

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JENNIFER L VELAZCO ESQ OBO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

03/22/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

03/27/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

05/12/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

05/12/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

05/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

05/11/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

05/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT & DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JENNIFER L VELAZCO ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM FL INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less