Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 15:58:07 (UTC).

JOHN EGNER -VS- TROY SOLANO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 JOHN EGNER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TROY SOLANO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0745

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN EGNER

Defendant

TROY SOLANO

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TROY SOLANO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033532

03/15/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TROY SOLANO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033532

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TROY SOLANO O/C W/MO TO SCSO

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TROY SOLANO O/C W/MO TO SCSO

COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED (POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TROY SOLANO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT - 3/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D TROY SOLANO PSTD 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D TROY SOLANO O/C W/MO TO SCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less