Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 15:42:31 (UTC).

JOHN EGNER -VS- ELYSHA REED HAWKINS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 JOHN EGNER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ELYSHA REED HAWKINS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0746

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN EGNER

Defendants

ELYSHA REED HAWKINS

CIERA HAWKINS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ELYSHA REED HAWKINS & CIERA HAWKINS

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ELYSHA REED HAWKINS & CIERA HAWKINS

COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D CIERA HAWKINS POSTED 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D ELYSHA REED HAWKINS 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D ELYSHA REED HAWKINS & CIERA HAWKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less