This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 22:24:28 (UTC).

JOHANNA BLEUS -VS- DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 JOHANNA BLEUS filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2714

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHANNA BLEUS

Defendant

DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JON LAMBE

Defendant Attorney

ASHBY MCCLANAHAN JR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

11/16/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

12/15/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED- DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/16/21

12/13/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED- DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/16/21

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DOCA CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/31/21

01/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DOCA CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/31/21

NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE BY DALE WILLIAMS DOCS CUSTOM

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE BY DALE WILLIAMS DOCS CUSTOM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ASHBY A MCCLANAHAN JR ESQ OBO DEFT

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ASHBY A MCCLANAHAN JR ESQ OBO DEFT

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - MAR 4 2022 @9:30AM - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/10/22

02/11/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - MAR 4 2022 @9:30AM - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/10/22

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

03/04/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/7/22

03/07/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/7/22

LETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

03/07/2022: LETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE RUDISILL REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ASHBY A MCCLANAHAN JR ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - MAR 4 2022 @9:30AM - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DOCA CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/31/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE BY DALE WILLIAMS DOCS CUSTOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- DOCS CUSTOM BUILT TRANSMISSION 12/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLANAHAN JR, A. A.