This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/27/2021 at 17:07:47 (UTC).

JAYALA AGR LLC -VS- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSU

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 JAYALA AGR LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSU. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6099

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAYALA AGR LLC

CARLOS SANS

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

09/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/7/21

09/07/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/7/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2021-09-03 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/03/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 11/15/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 11/15/2021 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM ENGLAND