Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 04:35:31 (UTC).

JAY SMITH -VS- FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 JAY SMITH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0768

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAY SMITH

Defendant

FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWRENCE OBIN II

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER TICE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

03/01/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/01/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DFET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER A TICE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D - FL PENINSULA INS CO ON 3/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FL PENINSULA INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Peninsula Insurance Company is a litigant