Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 17:20:00 (UTC).

JANE FREDRENE HILLS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 JANE FREDRENE HILLS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN D. GALLUZZO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0333

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN D. GALLUZZO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EBONE HILLS

Decedent

JANE FREDRENE HILLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING PROTECTED HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY 3/15/2021 JUDGE GALLUZZO Instrument: 2021036315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION 3/15/2021 JUDGE GALLUZZO Instrument: 2021034750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY Instrument: 2021031221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket*DENIED* ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket*DENIED* ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY Instrument: 2021027267

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION Instrument: 2021027266

    Read MoreRead Less