Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:31:44 (UTC).

INEZ RODRIGUEZ -VS- LYNETT R YANCY

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 INEZ RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LYNETT R YANCY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0469

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INEZ RODRIGUEZ

Sanford, FL 32773

Defendants

MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSEPCION

Sanford, FL 32771

LYNETT R YANCY

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SUE SELSKY

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY DEFTS

03/16/2020: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY DEFTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

03/09/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DICKEY 3/11/20

03/12/2020: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DICKEY 3/11/20

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE -SUE SELSKY OBO DEFTS

02/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE -SUE SELSKY OBO DEFTS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AMENDED) BY DEFTS

02/17/2020: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AMENDED) BY DEFTS

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF STANDING BY DEFTS

02/17/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF STANDING BY DEFTS

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO BE PLACED IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFTS

02/17/2020: MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO BE PLACED IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFTS

ANSWER BY DEFTS

02/11/2020: ANSWER BY DEFTS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D LYNETT R YANCY 2/11/20

02/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D LYNETT R YANCY 2/11/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSPECION 2/11/20

02/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSPECION 2/11/20

COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

02/07/2020: COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D LYNETT R YANCY O/C TO PLTF

02/07/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D LYNETT R YANCY O/C TO PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSEPCION O/C TO PLTF

02/07/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSEPCION O/C TO PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DICKEY 3/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT TO BE PLACED IN COURT REGISTRY BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF STANDING BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AMENDED) BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE -SUE SELSKY OBO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSPECION 2/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D LYNETT R YANCY 2/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D MICHELLE MARIE RIVERA CONSEPCION O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D LYNETT R YANCY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUE SELSKY