This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/03/2022 at 21:15:50 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO -VS- JENNIFER L WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATIO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JENNIFER L WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0571

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

WELLS FARGO HOME EQUITY ASSET BACKED SECURITIES 2006 1 TRUST HOME EQUITY ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES S

Defendants

JENNIFER L WILLIAMS

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

JARRET GREENE

RUBY WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTIN SWOSINSKI

Defendant Attorney

PETER LANNING

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLFT Instrument: 2022107591

09/19/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLFT Instrument: 2022107591

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

05/13/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/17/22

05/17/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/17/22

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED BY PLTF

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED BY PLTF

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 5/31/22 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/6/22

05/06/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 5/31/22 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/6/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK 3/31/22

04/13/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK 3/31/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNK PARTY #1 NKA RUBY WILLIAMS 3/26/22

04/18/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNK PARTY #1 NKA RUBY WILLIAMS 3/26/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK PARTY #2 NKA JARRET GREENE 3/26/22

04/18/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK PARTY #2 NKA JARRET GREENE 3/26/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS 3/26/22

04/18/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS 3/26/22

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

03/14/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022031804

03/14/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022031804

VALUE SHEET

03/14/2022: VALUE SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - WELLS FARGTO FINANCIAL BANK

03/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WELLS FARGTO FINANCIAL BANK

SUMMONS ISSUED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS

03/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #1

03/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #1

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #2

03/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #2

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/14/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLFT Instrument: 2022107591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON 5/31/22 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 5/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS 3/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK PARTY #2 NKA JARRET GREENE 3/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNK PARTY #1 NKA RUBY WILLIAMS 3/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK 3/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE BY DEFT JENNIFER WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JENNIFER L WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WELLS FARGTO FINANCIAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022031804

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Home Equity is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANNING, PETER