This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 00:06:31 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NA -VS- DANIEL LYNCH JR

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 HSBC BANK USA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DANIEL LYNCH JR. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0275

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HSBC BANK USA NA

RENAISSANCE HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST 2007 2

Defendants

DANIEL LYNCH JR

DANIEL LYNCH

DEIDRA A LYNCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSANDRA JEFFRIES

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/22/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLTF Instrument: 2023046721

05/22/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLTF Instrument: 2023046721

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH & DEIDRA A LYNCH 5/12/23

05/12/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH & DEIDRA A LYNCH 5/12/23

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS BY PLTF

05/12/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS

05/12/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

05/08/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/17/23

04/17/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/17/23

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH 2/8/23

02/15/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH 2/8/23

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DEIDRA A LYNCH 2/8/23

02/15/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DEIDRA A LYNCH 2/8/23

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/06/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIG NOTE

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIG NOTE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023011119

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023011119

SUMMONS ISSUED - DEIDRA A LYNCH

02/06/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - DEIDRA A LYNCH

SUMMONS ISSUED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LUNCH

02/06/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LUNCH

VALUE SHEET

02/06/2023: VALUE SHEET

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/06/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL & RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ BY PLTF Instrument: 2023046721

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH & DEIDRA A LYNCH 5/12/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DEIDRA A LYNCH 2/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LYNCH 2/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONSIBLE ATTORNEY BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - DANIEL LYNCH JR AKA DANIEL LUNCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - DEIDRA A LYNCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023011119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIG NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less