Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 18:21:41 (UTC).

HAE JIN LEE -VS- FL PENINSULA INS CO

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 HAE JIN LEE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FL PENINSULA INS CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELANIE CHASE and JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0331

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELANIE CHASE

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAE JIN LEE

Longwood, FL 32779

Defendant

FL PENINSULA INS CO

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID LOW

COREY ACKERMAN

Defendant Attorneys

EVELYN CRANFORD

JESSICA LEVY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY COREY ACKERMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

06/30/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY COREY ACKERMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (AMENDED) BY JESSICA D LEVY OBO DEFT

07/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (AMENDED) BY JESSICA D LEVY OBO DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS (AMENDED) BY JESSICA LEVY OBO DEFT

07/07/2020: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS (AMENDED) BY JESSICA LEVY OBO DEFT

PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PTLF 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY DEFT

05/07/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PTLF 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

04/13/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

04/03/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

04/03/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED & OBJECTIONS TO 1ST SET BY DEFT

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED & OBJECTIONS TO 1ST SET BY DEFT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGST DEFT FL PENINSULA INS CO - BY PLTF

04/02/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGST DEFT FL PENINSULA INS CO - BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

04/03/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FL PENINSULA INS CO 2/14/20

02/25/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FL PENINSULA INS CO 2/14/20

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY EVELYN L CRANFORD OBO DEFT

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY EVELYN L CRANFORD OBO DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/10/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - FL PENINSULA INS CO

02/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - FL PENINSULA INS CO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

02/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

02/10/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

02/10/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS (AMENDED) BY JESSICA LEVY OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (AMENDED) BY JESSICA D LEVY OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTY WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY COREY ACKERMAN ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PTLF 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AGST DEFT FL PENINSULA INS CO - BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED & OBJECTIONS TO 1ST SET BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY EVELYN L CRANFORD OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FL PENINSULA INS CO 2/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - FL PENINSULA INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FL PENINSULA INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY, JESSICA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANFORD EVELYN L