Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/16/2021 at 01:03:26 (UTC).

GLORIA VALLE -VS- SECURITY FIRST INS CO

Case Summary

On 09/12/2020 GLORIA VALLE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INS CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA L. MCINTOSH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2217

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA L. MCINTOSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLORIA VALLE

Miami, FL 33135

OCTAVIO VALLE

Miami, FL 33135

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INS CO

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUAN MOURIN

Defendant Attorneys

KELLY BARNES

BRITTANY PROULX AYS

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

10/19/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTFS BY DEFT

10/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTFS BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT

10/19/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTFS

10/20/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTFS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

11/13/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

11/13/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

LETTER TO JUDGE MCINTOSH REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

12/29/2020: LETTER TO JUDGE MCINTOSH REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OCTAVIO VALLE ON 1/26/21 @ 11:30AM

11/02/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OCTAVIO VALLE ON 1/26/21 @ 11:30AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THOMAS WAGGONER FEB 2 2020 @11:00AM

11/02/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF THOMAS WAGGONER FEB 2 2020 @11:00AM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORP REP FOR SECURITY FIRST INS CO FEB 19 2021 @1:30PM

11/02/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORP REP FOR SECURITY FIRST INS CO FEB 19 2021 @1:30PM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

09/12/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO

09/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

09/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

09/12/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

09/12/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF GLORIA VALLE & OCTAVIO VALLE JAN 26 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketORDER ON DEFTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DEPOSITION OF DEFTS CORP REP W/MEMORANDUM OF LAW - JUDGE MCINTOSH 1/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2ND) OF OCTAVIO VALLE ON 1/26/21 @ 3:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2ND) OF GLORIA VALLE ON 1/26/21 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE MCINTOSH REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DEPOSITION OF DEFTS CORP REP WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTFS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KELLY D BARNES OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRITTANY PROULX AYS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY BARNES