This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 11/25/2022 at 23:27:48 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY -VS- IAN MARK THOMAS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IAN MARK THOMAS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3763

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GINA RIZZO SERVELLON

Defendant

IAN MARK THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE SCHILLER

Defendant Attorney

DAVID BEAR

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

09/27/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

SUMMONS ISSUED IAN MARK THOMAS

09/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED IAN MARK THOMAS

COMPLAINT FILED

09/27/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

10/17/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - IAN MARK THOMAS 10/6/22

10/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - IAN MARK THOMAS 10/6/22

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT IAN MARK THOMAS

10/26/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT IAN MARK THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT IAN MARK THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID R BEAR ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - IAN MARK THOMAS 10/6/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED IAN MARK THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BEAR