This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/04/2022 at 17:41:54 (UTC).

GARY E EDMAN -VS- ROSARIO L EDMAN

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 GARY E EDMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROSARIO L EDMAN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1414

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARY E EDMAN

Respondent

ROSARIO L EDMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RUSSELL HERSHKOWITZ

Respondent Attorney

ADAM POLLACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION 8/8/2022 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE FLRP 12.285 / G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / A POLLACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE FLRP 12.285 / R EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / R EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION (AMENDED) /G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERPETITION / G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMEMORANDUM BY CLERK REGARDING NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketANSWER & COUNTER PETN / R EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF ADMIN ORDER 17-17-S EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER / G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE / G EDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO PETNR / R HERSHKOWITZ ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPETITION W/ADMIN ORDER 17-17-S ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSELL HERSHKOWITZ