This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/14/2023 at 11:01:54 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION -VS- DINESH K BALANI

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DINESH K BALANI. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0811

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

DINESH K BALANI

ROBYNN BALANI

SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVIN MACMILLAN

Defendant Attorneys

ANTHONY LEGENDRE II

K MATTINGLY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEB 16 2023 @11:00AM

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEB 16 2023 @11:00AM

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS ORDER ENTERED ON NOV 14 2022 BY DEFTS DINESH K BALANI & ROBYNN BALANI

12/05/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS ORDER ENTERED ON NOV 14 2022 BY DEFTS DINESH K BALANI & ROBYNN BALANI

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS - JUDGE RUDISILL 11/14/22

11/14/2022: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS - JUDGE RUDISILL 11/14/22

NOTICE OF POTENTIAL HURRICANCE IAN IMPACT & SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE BY PLTF

11/03/2022: NOTICE OF POTENTIAL HURRICANCE IAN IMPACT & SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE BY PLTF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

09/16/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

09/16/2022: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

MEMORANDUM BY CLERK TO GAVIN MACMILLAN ESQ RE NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

09/19/2022: MEMORANDUM BY CLERK TO GAVIN MACMILLAN ESQ RE NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & EMBEDDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY DEFTS BALANI

09/19/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & EMBEDDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY DEFTS BALANI

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS (2) BY PLTF

09/23/2022: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS (2) BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

04/11/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

VALUE SHEET

04/11/2022: VALUE SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022044480

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022044480

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANGEMENT PLAN

04/11/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

04/11/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - DINESH K BALANI

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - DINESH K BALANI

SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBYNN BALANI

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBYNN BALANI

SUMMONS ISSUED - SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

04/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION FEB 16 2023 @11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS ORDER ENTERED ON NOV 14 2022 BY DEFTS DINESH K BALANI & ROBYNN BALANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS - JUDGE RUDISILL 11/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POTENTIAL HURRICANCE IAN IMPACT & SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS (2) BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CMPL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT & EMBEDDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY DEFTS BALANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM BY CLERK TO GAVIN MACMILLAN ESQ RE NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FOR DINESH K BALANI & ROBYNN BALANI BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ROBYNN BALANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - DINESH K BALANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022044480

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less