Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 17:24:34 (UTC).

FREDS INVESTMENTS LLC -VS- CONSUELLA TORRES

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 FREDS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CONSUELLA TORRES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0711

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

CONSUELLA TORRES

ANGEL TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JERRON KELLEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 4/22/21 @ 1000AM CTRM B JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D CONSUELLA TORRES PSTD 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D ANGEL TORRES 3/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,025 COURT REGISTRY + $22.88 CLERKS FEE) FROM ANGEL TORRES - R#2021-121-004240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFTS (FILED @ BRANCH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D ANGEL TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D CONSUELLA TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less