This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 18:29:13 (UTC).

FLAWLESS WAX & SPA LLC -VS- MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 FLAWLESS WAX SPA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1908

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAWLESS WAX & SPA LLC

Defendants

MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC

MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS

MEDLASEREXPERTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARLETT MASSEY

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL HALLER

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

07/29/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS

07/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS

COMPLAINT FILED

07/29/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS 8/4/21

08/09/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS 8/4/21

MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO PROPER VENUE & RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

10/18/2021: MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO PROPER VENUE & RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - NOV 9 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 10/15/21

10/15/2021: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - NOV 9 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 10/15/21

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFT

08/24/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

11/09/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT & MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

11/08/2021: NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT & MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT & MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO PROPER VENUE & RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - NOV 9 2021 @3:00PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 10/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS 8/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS LLC DBA MEDICAL LASER EXPERTS DBA MEDLASEREXPERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haller, Mitchell