Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 13:46:24 (UTC).

FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION -VS- ROBIN YUKNAVAGE

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ROBIN YUKNAVAGE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELISSA D. SOUTO and DONNA L. MCINTOSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0235

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELISSA D. SOUTO

DONNA L. MCINTOSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION

3087 N Alafaya Trail

Orlando, FL 32826

Defendants

ROBIN YUKNAVAGE

Winter Springs, FL 32708

STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

Winter Springs, FL 32708

ADAM YUKNAVAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN ORSILLO

Defendant Attorney

RANDY HILLMAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JANE DOE

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JANE DOE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RANDY HILLMAN ESQ OBO DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RANDY HILLMAN ESQ OBO DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

03/19/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/19/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF DROPPING JANE DOE W/OUT PREJ

03/25/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING JANE DOE W/OUT PREJ

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE

03/30/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE - 3/31/20

03/30/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE - 3/31/20

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

04/01/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

04/07/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED-JOHN DOE 2/21/20

02/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED-JOHN DOE 2/21/20

SUMMONS ISSUED-STEVEN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

02/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED-STEVEN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

SUMMONS ISSUED-ROBIN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

02/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED-ROBIN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

SUMMONS ISSUED-JANE DOE 2/21/20

02/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED-JANE DOE 2/21/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/30/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011413

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011413

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

01/30/2020: VALUE SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE - 3/31/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT JOHN DOE NKA ADAM YUKNAVAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING JANE DOE W/OUT PREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY RANDY HILLMAN ESQ OBO DEFTS ROBIN & STEVEN YUKNAVAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STEVEN YUKNAVAGE ON 3/5/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-JANE DOE 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-ROBIN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-STEVEN YUKNAVAGE 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-JOHN DOE 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020011413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANDY HILLMAN