Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 13:13:32 (UTC).

FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION -VS- MIGUEL FRIAS

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIGUEL FRIAS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELANIE CHASE and JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0222

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELANIE CHASE

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION

3087 N Alafaya Trail

Orlando, FL 32826

Defendants

GRISELDA FRIAS

Longwood, FL 32750

WOODLANDS EAST HOA INC

C/O Barbara Cooper Registered Agent 987 Citrus, Wood Court

Longwood, FL 32750

MIGUEL FRIAS

Longwood, FL 32750

CHRIS FRIAS

MIGUEL FRIAS JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN ORSILLO

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW FITZPATRICK

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED WOODLANDS EAST HOA INC 3/9/20

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED WOODLANDS EAST HOA INC 3/9/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIGUEL FRIAS 3/9/20

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIGUEL FRIAS 3/9/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JANE DOE 3/9/20 AKA MIGUEL FRIAS JR

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JANE DOE 3/9/20 AKA MIGUEL FRIAS JR

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JOHN DOE 3/9/20 AKA CHRIS FRIAS

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JOHN DOE 3/9/20 AKA CHRIS FRIAS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GRISELDA FRIAS 3/9/20

03/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GRISELDA FRIAS 3/9/20

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ANDREW D FITZPATRICK OBO DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ANDREW D FITZPATRICK OBO DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

03/27/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

SUMMONS PENDING

02/19/2020: SUMMONS PENDING

SUMMONS PENDING

02/19/2020: SUMMONS PENDING

SUMMONS PENDING

02/19/2020: SUMMONS PENDING

SUMMONS PENDING

02/19/2020: SUMMONS PENDING

SUMMONS PENDING

02/19/2020: SUMMONS PENDING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/28/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020010706

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020010706

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

01/28/2020: VALUE SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ANDREW D FITZPATRICK OBO DEFTS MIGUEL FRIAS & GRISELDA FRIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GRISELDA FRIAS 3/9/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JOHN DOE 3/9/20 AKA CHRIS FRIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JANE DOE 3/9/20 AKA MIGUEL FRIAS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MIGUEL FRIAS 3/9/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED WOODLANDS EAST HOA INC 3/9/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-GRISELDA FRIAS 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-JANE DOE 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-MIGUEL FRIAS 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-WOODLANDS EAST HOA INC 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-JOHN DOE 2/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020010706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW FITZPATRICK