This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/22/2023 at 22:06:20 (UTC).

EXPERT NETWORK INC -VS- SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 EXPERT NETWORK INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0143

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXPERT NETWORK INC

MAI NGUYEN

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORIE DOLCE

Defendant Attorney

BIANCA FEAZELL

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/12/23

01/12/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/12/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

01/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/11/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS OBO PLTF -GERGORIE DOLCE ESQ

01/11/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS OBO PLTF -GERGORIE DOLCE ESQ

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/11/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/01/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/8/23

03/08/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/8/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BIANCA FEAZELL ESQ OBO DEFT

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BIANCA FEAZELL ESQ OBO DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BIANCA FEAZELL ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/01/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/12/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/01/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS OBO PLTF -GERGORIE DOLCE ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less