This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 04:17:27 (UTC).

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC -VS- AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATI

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 EMBARQ FLORIDA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATI. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES J. DEKLEVA and FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4079

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC

CENTURYLINK

Defendant

AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS MACCARI

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL LUNDEEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/12/22 @ 11AM

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/12/22 @ 11AM

MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

04/19/2022: MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY PLTF

04/20/2022: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY PLTF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 4/18/22 @ 1PM

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 4/18/22 @ 1PM

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/20/21

12/21/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/20/21

NOTICE OF HEARING DEC 15 2021 @9:30AM

10/22/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING DEC 15 2021 @9:30AM

MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY PLTF

10/07/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

07/27/2021: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIP TO WAIVE PTC & INVOKE RULES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 8/3/21

08/03/2021: ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIP TO WAIVE PTC & INVOKE RULES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 8/3/21

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

06/21/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

06/21/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

07/07/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

07/07/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

05/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

05/25/2021: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

06/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AMERICAN LIGHTING & SIGNALIZATION LLC 6/14/21

06/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AMERICAN LIGHTING & SIGNALIZATION LLC 6/14/21

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/12/22 @ 11AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 4/18/22 @ 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING DEC 15 2021 @9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING JOINT STIP TO WAIVE PTC & INVOKE RULES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 8/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MITCHELL L LUNDEEN ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AMERICAN LIGHTING & SIGNALIZATION LLC 6/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 08/10/2021 at 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN LIGHTING AND SIGNALIZATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Embarq Florida Inc dba CenturyLink is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL LEE LUNDEEN