This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/15/2023 at 15:00:55 (UTC).

ELR RESTORATION INC -VS- AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 ELR RESTORATION INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2677

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELR RESTORATION INC

ABHIJEET WANKHEDE

MINAL RAMTEKE

Defendant

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORIE DOLCE

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

11/14/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/14/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

11/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

11/11/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

11/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

11/11/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

COMPLAINT FILED

11/11/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

11/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

ORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/11/23 Instrument: 2023033237

04/11/2023: ORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/11/23 Instrument: 2023033237

ORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 3/29/23

03/29/2023: ORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 3/29/23

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 4/11/23 Instrument: 2023033237

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 3/29/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less