This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/19/2023 at 01:01:15 (UTC).

EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEO -VS- LUIS O GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LUIS O GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0166

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

LUIS O GONZALEZ

MICHELLE M SPENCER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT LUIS O GONZALEZ

03/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT LUIS O GONZALEZ

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT MICHELLE M SPENCER

03/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT MICHELLE M SPENCER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MICHELLE M SPENCER - 3/15/23

03/14/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MICHELLE M SPENCER - 3/15/23

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LUIS O GONZALEZ - 3/15/23

03/14/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LUIS O GONZALEZ - 3/15/23

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTF

03/24/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTF

NOTICE OF HEARING JUN 22 2023 @9:00AM

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING JUN 22 2023 @9:00AM

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF LUIS O GONZALEZ

02/07/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF LUIS O GONZALEZ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - LUIS O GONZALEZ 2/2/23

02/07/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - LUIS O GONZALEZ 2/2/23

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS BY FL COMMUNITY LAW GROUP PL OBO PLTF

02/13/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS BY FL COMMUNITY LAW GROUP PL OBO PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/24/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023006720

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023006720

SUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

01/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

01/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHELLE M SPENCER

01/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - MICHELLE M SPENCER

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MICHELLE M SPENCER

01/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MICHELLE M SPENCER

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

01/24/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED- UNK SPOUSE OF LUIS O GONZALEZ 1/30/23

01/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED- UNK SPOUSE OF LUIS O GONZALEZ 1/30/23

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING JUN 22 2023 @9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST LUIS O GONZALEZ - 3/15/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST MICHELLE M SPENCER - 3/15/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT MICHELLE M SPENCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT LUIS O GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM ADDRESS BY FL COMMUNITY LAW GROUP PL OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - LUIS O GONZALEZ 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF LUIS O GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF MICHELLE M SPENCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MICHELLE M SPENCER 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- UNK SPOUSE OF LUIS O GONZALEZ 1/30/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MICHELLE M SPENCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MICHELLE M SPENCER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - LUIS O GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023006720

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less