This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 04:50:44 (UTC).

EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEO -VS- HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2261

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EGRETS LANDING AT LAKE MARY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC

CHRIS MORAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

Defendant Attorney

KATINA HARDEE

 

Court Documents

VALUE SHEET

09/21/2022: VALUE SHEET

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

09/21/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022108000

09/21/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022108000

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANTS

09/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANTS

SUMMONS ISSUED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC

09/21/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC

COMPLAINT FILED

09/21/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KATINA M HARDEE ESQ OBO DEFT

10/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KATINA M HARDEE ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC 9/27/22

10/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC 9/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANTS IN POSSESSION IF ANY NKA CHRIS MORAN 10/7/22

10/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANTS IN POSSESSION IF ANY NKA CHRIS MORAN 10/7/22

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ & DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022116343

10/18/2022: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ & DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022116343

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ & DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022116343

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC 9/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNK TENANTS IN POSSESSION IF ANY NKA CHRIS MORAN 10/7/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KATINA M HARDEE ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022108000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - HPA BORROWER 2016 1 LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less