This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 02:32:51 (UTC).

DONNA M SMITH -VS- STRATES SHOWS INC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 DONNA M SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STRATES SHOWS INC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2549

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA M SMITH

Miami, FL 33156

Defendants

STRATES SHOWS, INC.

Jay E. Strates, Registered Agent, 10600 S. Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32824

STRATES SHOWS INC

Jay E. Strates, Registered Agent, 10600 S. Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMON CASTILLO

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY PRUSAK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AMENDED INTIAL BY DEFT

03/31/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AMENDED INTIAL BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (AMENDED) BY DEFT

03/31/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (AMENDED) BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PLTF

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

01/29/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (16)

01/29/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (16)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

02/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

02/23/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED)/ PTC ON 11/16/21 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 12/6/21 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/17/21

03/17/2021: ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED)/ PTC ON 11/16/21 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 12/6/21 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/17/21

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PTLF

12/17/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PTLF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND BY DEFT

11/19/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO PLTF BY DEFT

11/19/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY GREGORY J PRUSAK OBO DEFT

11/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY GREGORY J PRUSAK OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STRATES SHOWS INC 10/30/20

11/06/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STRATES SHOWS INC 10/30/20

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/21/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/21/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

COMPLAINT FILED

10/21/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF INSPECTION OF PROPERTY TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 9/20/21 @ 9:30AM - MEDIATOR GREGORY MILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (AMENDED) BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AMENDED INTIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED)/ PTC ON 11/16/21 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 12/6/21 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC JUL 21 @1:00PM/JURY TRIAL DURING THE (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING AUG 9 2021 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL JURY (5) DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO PLFT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STRATES SHOWS INC 10/30/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY GREGORY J PRUSAK OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - STRATES SHOWS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATES SHOWS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRUSAK , GREGORY JOSEPH