This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/19/2023 at 08:01:28 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMP -VS- WARREN B MOORE

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WARREN B MOORE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0591

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005 14 MORTGAGE LOAN PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005 14

Defendants

WARREN B MOORE

WARREN BARRY MOORE

SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

STEVEN C MOORE

KASHAKA L JARRELL

PATTI R JARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRATIK PATEL

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH TAORMINO

K MATTINGLY

 

Court Documents

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED BY PLTF

04/21/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED BY PLTF

03/18/2023: NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED BY PLTF

MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC VIRTUAL TESTIMONY & FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT TRIAL BY PLTF

03/20/2023: MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC VIRTUAL TESTIMONY & FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT TRIAL BY PLTF

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

03/20/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

NOTICE FOR TRIAL NON JURY (30) MINUTES

03/21/2023: NOTICE FOR TRIAL NON JURY (30) MINUTES

MOTION TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

03/21/2023: MOTION TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRE TRIAL COMPLIANCE - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/29/23

03/29/2023: ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRE TRIAL COMPLIANCE - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/29/23

NOTICE OF SERVING COURTS ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRETRIAL COMPLIANCE BY PLTF

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING COURTS ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRETRIAL COMPLIANCE BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO DEFT WARREN B MOORE BY PLTF

03/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO DEFT WARREN B MOORE BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/16/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

03/16/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022032491

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022032491

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

03/16/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/16/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

VALUE SHEET

03/16/2022: VALUE SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

03/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED - WARREN B MOORE AKA WARREN BARRY MOORE

03/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - WARREN B MOORE AKA WARREN BARRY MOORE

SUMMONS ISSUED - KASHAKA L JARRELL

03/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KASHAKA L JARRELL

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO DEFT WARREN B MOORE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING COURTS ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRETRIAL COMPLIANCE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL & REQUIRING PRE TRIAL COMPLIANCE - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/29/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL NON JURY (30) MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC VIRTUAL TESTIMONY & FOR COUNSEL TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT TRIAL BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE KASHAKA L JARRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KASHAKA L JARRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WARREN B MOORE AKA WARREN BARRY MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022032491

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less