This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/04/2023 at 18:16:36 (UTC).

DAVID SOLORZANO -VS- SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 DAVID SOLORZANO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0172

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID SOLORZANO

MYRIAM SOLORZANO

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATASHA RIVERA

Defendant Attorney

CHANCEY SMITH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF ATTY

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF ATTY

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER (ATTACHED ENTIRE ADMIN ORDER)

01/25/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER (ATTACHED ENTIRE ADMIN ORDER)

SUMMONS ISSUED - SCOTTSDALE INS CO

01/25/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - SCOTTSDALE INS CO

LETTER RE: DEPO DATES

01/25/2023: LETTER RE: DEPO DATES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

01/25/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

01/25/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SCOTTSDALE INS CO 2/2/23

02/02/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SCOTTSDALE INS CO 2/2/23

NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION BY DEFT

02/27/2023: NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION BY DEFT

CERTIFICATE /CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY DEFT

02/27/2023: CERTIFICATE /CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

02/22/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE /CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SCOTTSDALE INS CO 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER (ATTACHED ENTIRE ADMIN ORDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SCOTTSDALE INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER RE: DEPO DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less