Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 20:31:25 (UTC).

DARRIN C LAVINE -VS- US BANK NATL ASSN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 DARRIN C LAVINE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against US BANK NATL ASSN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0289

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARRIN C LAVINE

Longwood, FL 32779

Defendants

US BANK NATL ASSN

C/O Ct Corporation System 1200 Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

CITIGROUP MTG LOAN TRUST INC MTG PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 AR1

BANK OF AMERICA NA

MTG ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KATHRYN HOECK

RICHARD CLERGE-APOLLON

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PLTF

05/26/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO REOPEN CASE & AMENDED CMPL EFILED ON 4/20/20 IS ACCEPTED - JUDGE STACY 5/24/20 (AMENDED CMPL IS NOT ON DOCKET)

05/26/2020: ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO REOPEN CASE & AMENDED CMPL EFILED ON 4/20/20 IS ACCEPTED - JUDGE STACY 5/24/20 (AMENDED CMPL IS NOT ON DOCKET)

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

05/20/2020: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CMPL BY 5/26/20 - BY PLTF

05/13/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CMPL BY 5/26/20 - BY PLTF

MOTION TO REOPEN IMPROPERLY CLOSED CASE & ACCEPTANCE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLTF

04/24/2020: MOTION TO REOPEN IMPROPERLY CLOSED CASE & ACCEPTANCE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS US BANK NATL ASSN & NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

03/04/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS US BANK NATL ASSN & NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT & MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY DEFT US BANKS & NATIONSTAR

03/09/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT & MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY DEFT US BANKS & NATIONSTAR

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND GRANTED /PLTF MUST FILE AMENDED CMPL ON OR BEFORE 4/13/20 - JUDGE STACY 3/17/20

03/17/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND GRANTED /PLTF MUST FILE AMENDED CMPL ON OR BEFORE 4/13/20 - JUDGE STACY 3/17/20

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS TO PARTIES BY DEFTS US BANK & NATIONSTAR

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS TO PARTIES BY DEFTS US BANK & NATIONSTAR

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020013851

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020013851

SUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

SUMMONS ISSUED - US BANK NATL ASSN AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MTG LOAN TRUST INC MTG PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 AR1

02/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - US BANK NATL ASSN AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MTG LOAN TRUST INC MTG PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 AR1

COMPLAINT FILED

02/04/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - MTG ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MTG ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION TO REOPEN CASE & AMENDED CMPL EFILED ON 4/20/20 IS ACCEPTED - JUDGE STACY 5/24/20 (AMENDED CMPL IS NOT ON DOCKET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CMPL BY 5/26/20 - BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REOPEN IMPROPERLY CLOSED CASE & ACCEPTANCE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF AGREED ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS TO PARTIES BY DEFTS US BANK & NATIONSTAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND GRANTED /PLTF MUST FILE AMENDED CMPL ON OR BEFORE 4/13/20 - JUDGE STACY 3/17/20 (CASE CLOSED ON 4/14/2020) Instrument: 2020039808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT & MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES BY DEFT US BANKS & NATIONSTAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME BY DEFTS US BANK NATL ASSN & NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY KATHRYN B HOECK ESQ OBO DEFT US BANK NATL ASSN & NATION STAR MTG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS BY DEFTS BANK OF AMERICA NA & MTG ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MTG ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - US BANK NATL ASSN AS TRUSTEE FOR CITIGROUP MTG LOAN TRUST INC MTG PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 AR1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONSTAR MTG LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020013851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mtg Electronic Registration Sys Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mtg LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where US Bank Nat Assn is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant