This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/07/2022 at 11:42:07 (UTC).

DANYS MUSGRAVE -VS- NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 DANYS MUSGRAVE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1676

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANYS MUSGRAVE

Defendant

NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOGAN TEMPLETON

Defendant Attorney

FRANK MADIA

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

01/10/2022: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

12/09/2021: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF C/R OF DEFT 11/17/21 1PM

11/15/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF C/R OF DEFT 11/17/21 1PM

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/22/21

09/23/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/22/21

LETTER TO JUDGE RE: PROPOSED ORDER

09/27/2021: LETTER TO JUDGE RE: PROPOSED ORDER

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

10/22/2021: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

10/22/2021: LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER ON DEFT MOTION TO DETERMINE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITION - DENIED & PLTF MOTION TO COMPEL EARLIER DEPOSITION DATE - GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 10/22/21

10/22/2021: ORDER ON DEFT MOTION TO DETERMINE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITION - DENIED & PLTF MOTION TO COMPEL EARLIER DEPOSITION DATE - GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 10/22/21

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT CORP REP NOV 17 2021 @1:00PM

11/05/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT CORP REP NOV 17 2021 @1:00PM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONAL SPECIALTY INS CO

06/30/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONAL SPECIALTY INS CO

COMPLAINT FILED

06/30/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LOGAN C TEMPLTON OBO PLTF

06/30/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LOGAN C TEMPLTON OBO PLTF

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

06/30/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

06/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

06/30/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO DEFT BY PTLF

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO DEFT BY PTLF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE BY PLTF

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE BY PLTF

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF C/R OF DEFT 11/17/21 1PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT CORP REP NOV 17 2021 @1:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFT MOTION TO DETERMINE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITION - DENIED & PLTF MOTION TO COMPEL EARLIER DEPOSITION DATE - GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 10/22/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE RE: PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/22/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO DEFT BY PTLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LOGAN C TEMPLTON OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - NATIONAL SPECIALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK MADIA