Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 02:56:00 (UTC).

CYNTHIA KAY MELTON -VS- ANGEL TORRES

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 CYNTHIA KAY MELTON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANGEL TORRES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0712

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYNTHIA KAY MELTON

Defendant

ANGEL TORRES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE/LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

02/25/2021: NOTICE/LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21 Instrument: 2021036041

03/17/2021: AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21 Instrument: 2021036041

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

03/18/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT - 3/12/21

03/10/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT - 3/12/21

LETTER FROM NON-PARTY TABITHA CABASSA

03/12/2021: LETTER FROM NON-PARTY TABITHA CABASSA

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033844

03/16/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033844

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D ANGEL TORRES POSTED 3/2/21

03/04/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D ANGEL TORRES POSTED 3/2/21

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ANGEL TORRES O/C W/MO TO SCSO

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ANGEL TORRES O/C W/MO TO SCSO

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/26/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21 Instrument: 2021036041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ANGEL TORRES - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/15/21 Instrument: 2021033844

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM NON-PARTY TABITHA CABASSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFT - 3/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D ANGEL TORRES POSTED 3/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D ANGEL TORRES O/C W/MO TO SCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE/LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT WEST BRANCH

    Read MoreRead Less