Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 18:33:59 (UTC).

CUONG HO -VS- BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 CUONG HO filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0582

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUONG HO

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

STEPHANIE JOHNSON

Sanford, FL 32771

BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK

918 French Ave

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROOKE SKAGGS

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING & FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FIANL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

03/23/2020: MOTION TO CANCEL HEARING & FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FIANL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & MOTION TO REQUIRE PAYMENT OF RENT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/20 Instrument: 2020028862

03/16/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & MOTION TO REQUIRE PAYMENT OF RENT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/20 Instrument: 2020028862

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

03/17/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & FOR HEARING BY DEFTS

03/12/2020: EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & FOR HEARING BY DEFTS

ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION / HEARING ON 3/26/20 @ 9 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/12/20

03/12/2020: ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION / HEARING ON 3/26/20 @ 9 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/12/20

NOTICE OF HEARING 3/26/209AM

03/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING 3/26/209AM

NOTICE /CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMETN BEING VACATED & MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFT TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

03/13/2020: NOTICE /CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMETN BEING VACATED & MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFT TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AGAINST DEFTS

03/04/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AGAINST DEFTS

PROPOSED ORDER

03/04/2020: PROPOSED ORDER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

03/05/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK & STEPHANIE JOHNSON 3/4/20

03/03/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK & STEPHANIE JOHNSON 3/4/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC 2/21/20

03/03/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC 2/21/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEPHANIE JOHNSON 2/21/20

03/03/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEPHANIE JOHNSON 2/21/20

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/24/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/19/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D STEPHANIE JOHNSON

02/19/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D STEPHANIE JOHNSON

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK

02/19/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingTYPE: EVICTION HEARING; DATE / TIME: 03/26/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CANCEL HEARING & FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FIANL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & MOTION TO REQUIRE PAYMENT OF RENT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/20 Instrument: 2020028862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE /CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMETN BEING VACATED & MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFT TO PAY RENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 3/26/900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCALENDAR: EH HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 03/26/2020 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION / HEARING ON 3/26/20 @ 9 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/12/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & FOR HEARING BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK & STEPHANIE JOHNSON - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025213

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AGAINST DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE STEPHANIE JOHNSON 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK & STEPHANIE JOHNSON 3/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D BROWNSTONES HAIR LLC BY MK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D STEPHANIE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKE SKAGGS