This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 11/25/2022 at 00:18:54 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC -VS- INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3887

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF OVIEDO

JOSEPH KIM

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER TUCCITTO

Defendant Attorney

MELISSA VAUGHAN

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

09/27/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

09/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

09/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MELISSA VAUGHAN ESQ OBO DEFT

10/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MELISSA VAUGHAN ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - INFINITY AUTO INS CO 10/3/22

10/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - INFINITY AUTO INS CO 10/3/22

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

10/20/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

ORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE SCHOTT 10/27/22

10/27/2022: ORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE SCHOTT 10/27/22

JOINT STIPULATION & AGREED ORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/26/2022: JOINT STIPULATION & AGREED ORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE SCHOTT 10/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION & AGREED ORDER INVOKING THE FL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY MELISSA VAUGHAN ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - INFINITY AUTO INS CO 10/3/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 9/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 10/31/2022 AT 1000AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELISSA VAUGHAN