This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 02:01:18 (UTC).

CINDY SANABRIA -VS- BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 CINDY SANABRIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0041

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY SANABRIA

Defendants

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANNON SNEDAKER

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL SWITZER

 

Court Documents

ORDER /NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

05/15/2023: ORDER /NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS UPDATED BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

05/23/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS UPDATED BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

03/29/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

01/31/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

02/01/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/06/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

01/06/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

01/06/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

01/06/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS UPDATED BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER /NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY MICHAEL W SWITZER ESQ OBO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BRIGHVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - RICHARD TERRY WICKMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less