This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/04/2023 at 07:03:58 (UTC).

CINDY GOPIE -VS- JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 CINDY GOPIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0050

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTOPHER SPRYSENSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY GOPIE

Defendants

JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FABIO DURAN

Defendant Attorney

HECTOR RAMIREZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/12/23 @ 9AM

05/26/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/12/23 @ 9AM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFTS BY PLTF

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFTS BY PLTF

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFT NUNC PRO TUNC BY PLTF

05/15/2023: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFT NUNC PRO TUNC BY PLTF

WAIVER OF OBJECTION BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES LLC

05/16/2023: WAIVER OF OBJECTION BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES LLC

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

05/16/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

ORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

05/15/2023: ORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

05/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

05/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

05/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY HECTOR V RAMIREZ OBO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY HECTOR V RAMIREZ OBO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPING

02/08/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPING

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

02/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

02/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/09/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/09/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS

01/09/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS

SUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

01/09/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

01/10/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/12/23 @ 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF OBJECTION BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFT NUNC PRO TUNC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - JUDGE SPRYSENSKI 5/15/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY HECTOR V RAMIREZ OBO DEFT BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JOEL ALBERTO VELEZ BURGOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less