This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 22:13:34 (UTC).

CHRISTINE ANN TARKOWSKI -VS- KB HOME

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 CHRISTINE ANN TARKOWSKI filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2001

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTINE ANN TARKOWSKI

KEVIN JAMES TARKOWSKI

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

KB HOME

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

GB PAINTING

A&B STUCCO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIL OBRIEN

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE HECKERT

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

AMY DEMARTINO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME FL LLC BY PLTFS

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME FL LLC BY PLTFS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME BY PLTFS

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME BY PLTFS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY PLTFS

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY PLTFS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT/3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT/3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

02/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF KEVIN JAMES TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF KEVIN JAMES TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

02/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT BY DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

09/14/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT BY DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT- A&B STUCCO INC 9/15/22

09/14/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT- A&B STUCCO INC 9/15/22

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

08/24/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME

08/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME

SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME FL LLC

08/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME FL LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

08/24/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

08/24/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

08/24/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME BY PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT KB HOME FL LLC BY PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT/3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF KEVIN JAMES TARKOWSKI BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO 3RD PARTY PLTF KB HOME ORLANDO LLC BY 3RD PARTY DEFT TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 1/10/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT- GB PAINTING INC 9/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT- A&B STUCCO INC 9/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & 3RD PARTY COMPLAINT BY DEFT KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME FL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less