This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/17/2023 at 08:03:52 (UTC).

CHELIDONIA RICHARD -VS- ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 CHELIDONIA RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALTAMONTE MALL LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2244

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHELIDONIA RICHARD

Defendants

ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS SCHMITT

Defendant Attorney

SONIA MCDOWELL

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/14/23

02/15/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/14/23

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

02/08/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

01/25/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

01/25/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

01/25/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CHELIDONIA RICHARD MAR 22 2023 @1:00PM

01/27/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CHELIDONIA RICHARD MAR 22 2023 @1:00PM

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/3/23

02/03/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/3/23

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL/MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

12/22/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL/MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

10/31/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

10/31/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

09/20/2022: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

09/20/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

09/20/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

09/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

09/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC

09/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CHELIDONIA RICHARD MAR 22 2023 @1:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SVCS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL/MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL/MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS CMPL FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION BY DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less