Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/23/2020 at 15:33:31 (UTC).

CENTRAL HOMES LLC -VS- UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 CENTRAL HOMES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0285

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL HOMES LLC

350 North Lake Destiny Road Suite 200

Maitland, FL 32751

JEANIE AHERN

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN SCHULZ

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE COLVILLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 6/9/20 @ 10:00AM OF ANDREW WEST

05/13/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 6/9/20 @ 10:00AM OF ANDREW WEST

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFTS CORP REP

05/13/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFTS CORP REP

MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER & AFFIRMANTIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

04/20/2020: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER & AFFIRMANTIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ANDREW WEST ON 6/9/20 @ 10 AM

04/09/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ANDREW WEST ON 6/9/20 @ 10 AM

SUBPOENA ISSUED TO ANDREW WEST BY ATTY SCHULZ

04/09/2020: SUBPOENA ISSUED TO ANDREW WEST BY ATTY SCHULZ

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFT CORPORATE REP

04/09/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFT CORPORATE REP

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

03/30/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF`S DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

03/13/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF`S DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY GEORGE C COLVILLE ESQ OBO DEFT

02/18/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY GEORGE C COLVILLE ESQ OBO DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPON TO CMPL BY DEFT

02/18/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPON TO CMPL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 1/29/20

02/01/2020: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 1/29/20

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION SEAN P SCHULZ ESQ OBO PLTF

02/01/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION SEAN P SCHULZ ESQ OBO PLTF

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF

02/01/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/24/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/24/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/24/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFTS CORP REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION ON 6/9/20 @ 10:00AM OF ANDREW WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER & AFFIRMANTIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED TO ANDREW WEST BY ATTY SCHULZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF ANDREW WEST ON 6/9/20 @ 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 8/6/20 @ 10:00AM OF DEFT CORPORATE REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF`S DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPON TO CMPL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY GEORGE C COLVILLE ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION SEAN P SCHULZ ESQ OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 1/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colville, George Cameron, ESQ