This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/25/2023 at 23:06:55 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC -VS- SHERECKA SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHERECKA SMITH. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE CULVER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5112

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE CULVER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

SHERECKA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY KAHN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

12/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED -CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

02/08/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED -CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

OPEN COURT MINUTES

02/07/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/31/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - SHERECKA SMITH

01/31/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - SHERECKA SMITH

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 4/18/23 @ 9:00AM CTRM F

03/15/2023: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 4/18/23 @ 9:00AM CTRM F

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/15/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED SHERECKA SMITH

03/02/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED SHERECKA SMITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/18/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: WAYNE CULVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [R] ON 04/18/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 4/18/23 @ 9:00AM CTRM F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/14/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: WAYNE CULVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED SHERECKA SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED -CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [R] ON 03/14/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 02/07/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: WAYNE CULVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - SHERECKA SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE CULVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [R] on 02/07/2023 at 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less