This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 21:05:22 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC -VS- JOSE GUDINO

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE GUDINO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0086

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

JOSE GUDINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY KAHN

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSE QUDINO 1/24/23

01/27/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSE QUDINO 1/24/23

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

01/09/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF ADMIN ORDER 21/24 AMENDED & CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

01/06/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF ADMIN ORDER 21/24 AMENDED & CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

01/06/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

COMPLAINT FILED

01/06/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

02/09/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSE QUDINO 1/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF ADMIN ORDER 21/24 AMENDED & CASE MGNT PLAN/ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOSE GUDINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less