This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/27/2023 at 15:09:44 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC -VS- CHRIS L ROOKS

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRIS L ROOKS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. HERR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4741

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. HERR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

CHRIS L ROOKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTINA MOEHLE

Defendant Attorney

ARTHUR RUBIN

 

Court Documents

OPEN COURT MINUTES

02/14/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 03/21/23 AT 9AM CTRM F

02/15/2023: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 03/21/23 AT 9AM CTRM F

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

02/17/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/17/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CHRIS L ROOKS 12/22/22

12/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CHRIS L ROOKS 12/22/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES/CLAIMS DISPUTED OBO DEFT -ARTHUR RUBIN ESQ

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES/CLAIMS DISPUTED OBO DEFT -ARTHUR RUBIN ESQ

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RESOLVED DISPUTES TO PLTF

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RESOLVED DISPUTES TO PLTF

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

01/04/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF

01/04/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF

01/04/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

01/10/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 02/14/23 AT 9AM CTRM F

01/10/2023: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 02/14/23 AT 9AM CTRM F

NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

01/22/2023: NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/01/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

12/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

12/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/21/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: MARK E. HERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [F] ON 03/21/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL TO 03/21/23 AT 9AM CTRM F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 02/14/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: MARK E. HERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [F] ON 02/14/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 01/10/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: MARK E. HERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES REGARDING RESOLVED DISPUTES TO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE /INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES/CLAIMS DISPUTED OBO DEFT -ARTHUR RUBIN ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CHRIS L ROOKS 12/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [F] on 01/10/2023 at 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less