This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 19:05:57 (UTC).

CASSANDRA BOYD -VS- ANN SIMON FUNK

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 CASSANDRA BOYD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANN SIMON FUNK. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1794

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASSANDRA BOYD

Defendant

ANN SIMON FUNK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY LIGHTBOURNE

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER BROOKS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PTLF

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PTLF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PTLF

12/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PTLF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

12/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

12/02/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

ORDER ON DEFT AMENDED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT - GRANTED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/21/22 Instrument: 2022128079

11/22/2022: ORDER ON DEFT AMENDED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT - GRANTED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/21/22 Instrument: 2022128079

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

11/22/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

11/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PERSONAL INJURY TO PTLF BY DEFT

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PERSONAL INJURY TO PTLF BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT

11/17/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ANN SIMON FUNK 9/14/22

09/16/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ANN SIMON FUNK 9/14/22

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

08/03/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

08/03/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

08/03/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

08/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

08/03/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFET

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFET

SUMMONS ISSUED - ANN SIMON FUNK

08/03/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ANN SIMON FUNK

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PTLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PTLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PERSONAL INJURY TO PTLF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFT AMENDED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT - GRANTED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/21/22 Instrument: 2022128079

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT AMENDED BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST ANN SIMON FUNK 10/7/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ANN SIMON FUNK 9/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ANN SIMON FUNK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS , JENNIFER