This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/26/2023 at 22:04:03 (UTC).

DANIELLE LUNARDELLI -VS- XL CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY UK LT

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 DANIELLE LUNARDELLI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against XL CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY UK LT. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2724

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELLE LUNARDELLI

Defendants

XL CATLIN INSURANCE COMPANY UK LTD

CONVEX INSURANCE UK LIMITED

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO LJ035FL300841

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI KADIR

Defendant Attorney

HOWARD BRILLIANT

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

04/27/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

04/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

04/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

04/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

04/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

04/27/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD CONVEX INS UK LIMITED AND CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS LLOYDS LONDONG SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO LJ035FL300841

04/27/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD CONVEX INS UK LIMITED AND CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS LLOYDS LONDONG SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO LJ035FL300841

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD 5/4/23

05/03/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD 5/4/23

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON 5/4/23

05/03/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON 5/4/23

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

06/09/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/25/23

05/25/2023: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/25/23

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

05/24/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ - JUDGE RUDISILL 7/12/23 Instrument: 2023063833

07/12/2023: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ - JUDGE RUDISILL 7/12/23 Instrument: 2023063833

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PARTIES

07/10/2023: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PARTIES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ - JUDGE RUDISILL 7/12/23 Instrument: 2023063833

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/25/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD 5/4/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON 5/4/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - XL CATLIN INS CO UK LTD CONVEX INS UK LIMITED AND CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS LLOYDS LONDONG SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO LJ035FL300841

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less