This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/10/2023 at 19:13:50 (UTC).

SAMUEL RAITI

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 SAMUEL RAITI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELANIE CHASE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0632

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELANIE CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBIN ROSE MARIE BROWER

Decedent

SAMUEL RAITI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRETT SWIGERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ORLANDO HEALTH $1,950.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION 06/01/2023 JUDGE CHASE Instrument: 2023050718

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL 05/31/2023 JUDGE CHASE Instrument: 2023049862

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT Instrument: 2023049861

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH LUCILLE B. RAITI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION Instrument: 2023038022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less