This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/15/2023 at 20:06:30 (UTC).

FLORIDA INJURY REHAB LLC -VS- TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURAN

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 FLORIDA INJURY REHAB LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURAN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2084

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA INJURY REHAB LLC

AMANDA EBANKS

Defendant

TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIM SNEDAKER

 

Court Documents

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

05/17/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/17/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/17/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-05-17 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FILED

05/17/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 5/18/23

05/18/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 5/18/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

05/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TRAVELERS HOME & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY 5/22/23

05/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TRAVELERS HOME & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY 5/22/23

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

07/07/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TRAVELERS HOME & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY 5/22/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 5/18/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 07/14/2023 AT 0130PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less