This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County on 10/13/2021 at 17:16:03 (UTC).

CAROL LEAVITT -VS- FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 CAROL LEAVITT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Seminole County, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2137

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAROL LEAVITT

MICHAEL LEAVITT

Defendant

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAF GOSS

KEVIN WEISSER

Defendant Attorney

CAROLIN PACHECO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY CAROLIN A PACHECO ESQ OBO DEFT

09/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY CAROLIN A PACHECO ESQ OBO DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL BY DEFT

09/29/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ZAF GOSS ESQ OBO PLTFS

10/01/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ZAF GOSS ESQ OBO PLTFS

ORDER ON DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT - GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/1/21

10/04/2021: ORDER ON DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT - GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/1/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED W/ATTACHED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

08/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED W/ATTACHED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DT OF DEFTS CORP REP: 1/7/22 @ 10:00AM

08/25/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DT OF DEFTS CORP REP: 1/7/22 @ 10:00AM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

08/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

08/25/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

08/25/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED - FARMERS INS EXCHANGE

08/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - FARMERS INS EXCHANGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT - GRANTED - JUDGE RUDISILL 10/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ZAF GOSS ESQ OBO PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY CAROLIN A PACHECO ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - FARMERS INS EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DT OF DEFTS CORP REP: 1/7/22 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED W/ATTACHED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pacheco, Carolin Angeny