Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 15:16:49 (UTC).

CARGLASS INC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 CARGLASS INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2430

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARGLASS INC

COREY RIZZARDI

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

04/13/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

04/13/2021: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 06/28/2021 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S)SET FOR 06/28/2021 AT 0200PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARGLASS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Direct Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant